NC S159 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-10 - Ch. SL 2009-288
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-10 - Ch. SL 2009-288
Summary
Update Funeral Expense Allowance/Estates.
Title
Update Funeral Expense Allowance/Estates.
Sponsors
Sen. Austin Allran [R] | Sen. Philip Berger [R] | Sen. Harris Blake [R] | Sen. Andrew Brock [R] |
Sen. Harry Brown [R] | Sen. Don East [R] | Sen. Edward Goodall [R] | Sen. Neal Hunt [R] |
Sen. Jim Jacumin [R] | Sen. Jean Preston [R] | Sen. John Snow [D] | Sen. Richard Stevens [R] |
Sen. Jerry Tillman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-10 | Ch. SL 2009-288 | |
2009-07-10 | Signed By Gov. 7/10/2009 | |
2009-07-02 | Pres. To Gov. 7/2/2009 | |
2009-07-01 | Ratified | |
2009-06-30 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2009-06-29 | Placed On Cal For 6/30/2009 | |
2009-06-29 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-06-25 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-24 | Placed On Cal For 6/25/2009 | |
2009-06-24 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-06-24 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-06-02 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-06-02 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-30 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-03-30 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-03-24 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-03-24 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-02-12 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-02-11 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S159 |