NC S202 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-24 - Failed 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-24 - Failed 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Modify Protective Services Law/ALE
Title
Modify Protective Services Law/ALE
Sponsors
Sen. Danny Britt [R] | Sen. Thomas McInnis [R] | Sen. Floyd McKissick [D] | Sen. James Bishop [R] |
Sen. Warren Daniel [R] | Sen. James Davis [R] | Sen. Natasha Marcus [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 54 N: 62 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-06-24 - House - Second Reading M4 Previous Question (Y: 66 N: 51 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - Second Reading M4 Previous Question (Y: 66 N: 51 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | House | Failed 2nd Reading |
2020-06-23 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/24/2020 |
2020-06-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2020-06-23 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-01 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 03/26/2019 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Filed |