NC S214 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-24 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-24 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Village of Wesley Chapel/Deannexation
Title
Village of Wesley Chapel/Deannexation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Finance Added |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Filed |