NC S247 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-03 - Re-ref Com On Local Government
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-03 - Re-ref Com On Local Government
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Raleigh/Donate Service Animals to Officers
Title
Raleigh/Donate Service Animals to Officers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | House | Re-ref Com On Local Government |
2015-06-03 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-06 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-04-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-02 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-04-01 | Engrossed | |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H199 (Same As) 2015-08-04 - Ch. SL 2015-174