NC S267 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-04 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Buncombe 1/4 Cent Sales Tax Use Restriction

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Buncombe 1/4 Cent Sales Tax Use Restriction

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-04HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-04HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-07-02HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2019-07-02SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-07-02SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-02SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-01SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-25SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-25SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-25SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-20SenateRe-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-06-18SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-18SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-13SenateRe-ref Com On State and Local Government
2019-06-13SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-13SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-11SenateRe-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-11SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-18SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-18SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-14SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback