NC S270 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - Ch. SL 2019-218
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Durham Deannexation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Durham Deannexation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - Senate - For Concurrence Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - For Concurrence Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-08-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-12 Ch. SL 2019-218
2019-09-12 Ratified
2019-09-11SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-09-11SenateConcurred On 3rd Reading
2019-09-10SenateConcurred On 2nd Reading
2019-08-28SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-08-28HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-08-27HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-08-26HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-08-22HousePlaced On Cal For 08/26/2019
2019-08-20HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-08-20HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-08-15HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-08-15HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-07-31HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-07-31HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-30HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-07-30HouseRuled Material
2019-07-30HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-26HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-26HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-19HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-06-19HouseReptd Fav
2019-05-21HouseRe-ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-21HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-25HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-25HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-22HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-04-22SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-04-18SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-17SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-16SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-10SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-10SenateReptd Fav
2019-03-26SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-03-26SenateReptd Fav
2019-03-19SenateRe-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-19SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-18SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-18SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-14SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S270
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S270v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S270v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S270v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S270v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S270v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S270v5.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/95
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/105
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/782
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/785
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/582
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/585

Bill Comments

feedback