NC S272 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-267
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-267
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Victims' Compensation Law Changes.-AB
Title
Victims' Compensation Law Changes.-AB
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Ch. SL 2011-267 | |
2011-06-23 | Signed By Gov. 6/23/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Pres. To Gov. 6/16/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Ratified | |
2011-06-14 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2011-06-14 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2011 | |
2011-06-14 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2011-06-13 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-09 | Placed On Cal For 6/13/2011 | |
2011-06-08 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-08 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-18 | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B | |
2011-04-18 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-13 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-12 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-04-12 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-03-09 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2011-03-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-08 | Filed |