NC S308 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-03 - Ch. SL 2010-187
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Low Profit Limited Liability Company

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Low Profit Limited Liability Company

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-07-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-08-03 Ch. SL 2010-187
2010-08-03 Signed By Gov. 8/3/2010
2010-07-09 Pres. To Gov. 7/9/2010
2010-07-09 Ratified
2010-07-09 Passed 3rd Reading
2010-07-08 Passed 2nd Reading
2010-07-07 Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010
2010-07-07 Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2010-07-07 Reptd Fav
2010-06-30 Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
2010-06-30 Withdrawn From Com
2009-07-22 Re-ref Com On Finance
2009-07-22 Reptd Fav
2009-07-13 Ref to the Com on Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship, if favorable, Finance
2009-07-13 Passed 1st Reading
2009-07-08 Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading
2009-07-01 Placed On Cal For 7/8/2009
2009-07-01 Com Substitute Adopted
2009-07-01 Reptd Fav Com Substitute
2009-02-26 Ref To Com On Finance
2009-02-25 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H769 (Same As) 2009-03-25 - Ref to the Com on Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship, if favorable, Finance

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback