NC S35 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-9)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Ch. Res 2013-10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-9)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Ch. Res 2013-10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honor Ed Jones
Title
Honor Ed Jones
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Ch. Res 2013-10 | |
2013-05-07 | Ratified | |
2013-05-06 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-05-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-06 | House | Added to Calendar |
2013-05-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-06 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H46 (Same As) 2013-05-06 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House