NC S356 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Ch. SL 2009-133
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Ch. SL 2009-133
Summary
Amend Nursing Practice Act.
Title
Amend Nursing Practice Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Rand [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Ch. SL 2009-133 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed By Gov. 6/19/2009 | |
2009-06-10 | Pres. To Gov. 6/10/2009 | |
2009-06-09 | Ratified | |
2009-06-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-04 | Placed On Cal For 6/8/2009 | |
2009-06-04 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-06-04 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-06-01 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III | |
2009-06-01 | Cal Pursuant 32(a) | |
2009-06-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-18 | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Judiciary III, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-03-18 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-16 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-03-12 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-03 | Ref To Com On Health Care | |
2009-03-02 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S356 |