NC S359 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-27 - Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-27 - Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Community Health Centers Grant Program/Funds
Title
Community Health Centers Grant Program/Funds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H367 (Same As) 2017-03-16 - Ref To Com On Appropriations