NC S375 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limit Payroll Deduct./Wage Withhold
Title
Limit Payroll Deduct./Wage Withhold
Sponsors
Sen. Ralph Hise [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Today's Supplemental Calendar |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Filed |