NC S381 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Hearing: May 29 @ 10:00 am in 544 LOB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Reconstitute & Clarify Environmental Boards

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reconstitute & Clarify Environmental Boards

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20HouseRe-ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-20HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-25HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-25HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-22HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-04-22SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-04-18SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-18SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-17SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-10SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-10SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-04-10SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-28SenateRe-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-28SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-28SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-28SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-27SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback