NC S4 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Ch. SL 2019-7
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Extend Terms of 2 Members/Coastal Carolina CC

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extend Terms of 2 Members/Coastal Carolina CC

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Ch. SL 2019-7
2019-03-21 Ratified
2019-03-20HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-03-20HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-20HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-19HousePlaced On Cal For 03/20/2019
2019-03-19HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-03-19HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-06HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-06HouseReptd Fav
2019-02-20HouseRef to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-20HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-19HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-02-19SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-02-18SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-02-18SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-02-14SenateReptd Fav
2019-02-12SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-12SenateReptd Fav
2019-01-31SenateRe-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-01-31SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-01-31SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-01-31SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-01-30SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback