NC S423 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Ch. SL 2015-135
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Ch. SL 2015-135
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Foster Care Family Act
Title
Foster Care Family Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - A1 Stevens Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - A1 Stevens Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | Ch. SL 2015-135 | |
2015-07-02 | Signed by Gov. 7/2/2015 | |
2015-06-25 | Pres. To Gov. 06/25/2015 | |
2015-06-24 | Ratified | |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/23/2015 |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2015-06-17 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-06-16 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2015-06-16 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-06-16 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-06-16 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-06-15 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/16/2015 |
2015-06-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-06-11 | House | Serial Referral To Insurance Stricken |
2015-06-11 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-06-03 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III |
2015-06-03 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-30 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Judiciary III, if favorable, Insurance |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-29 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/28/2015 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Insurance |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Insurance Added |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary I |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H407 (Same As) 2016-06-28 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House