NC S426 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public Finance Laws/Municipal Service Dists
Title
Public Finance Laws/Municipal Service Dists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - Senate - Third Reading\Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading\Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - House - Third Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading\Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - House - Third Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-12 | Ch. SL 2012-156 | |
2012-07-12 | Signed By Gov. 7/12/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Ratified | |
2012-06-28 | Concurred On 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-27 | Concurred On 2nd Reading | |
2012-06-26 | Placed On Cal For 6/27/2012 | |
2012-06-26 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2012-06-26 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-25 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-06-25 | Placed On Cal For 6/25/2012 | |
2012-06-25 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-25 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-06-20 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2012-06-20 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-19 | Placed On Cal For 6/20/2012 | |
2012-06-19 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-19 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-05-25 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2011-05-25 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-23 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-05-19 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-05-18 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-05-18 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-05-11 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-05-11 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-05-10 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-05-10 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-03-28 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2011-03-28 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-24 | Filed |