NC S444 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-23 - Ch. SL 2013-322
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-23 - Ch. SL 2013-322
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
UNC/Cherokee Language
Title
UNC/Cherokee Language
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - THIRD READING (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - THIRD READING (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-23 | Ch. SL 2013-322 | |
2013-07-23 | Signed by Gov. 7/23/2013 | |
2013-07-19 | Pres. To Gov. 07/19/2013 | |
2013-07-18 | Ratified | |
2013-07-17 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-07-17 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-07-17 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-07-15 | House | Postponed To 07/17/2013 |
2013-07-11 | House | Postponed To 07/15/2013 |
2013-07-10 | House | Postponed To 07/11/2013 |
2013-07-09 | House | Postponed To 07/10/2013 |
2013-06-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/09/2013 |
2013-06-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-06-26 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-05-15 | House | Ref To Com On Education |
2013-05-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-14 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Filed |