NC S445 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-28 - Ch. SL 2017-195
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-28 - Ch. SL 2017-195
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Expungement Process Modifications
Title
Expungement Process Modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Wyatt Tucker [R] | Sen. Angela Bryant [D] | Sen. Floyd McKissick [D] | Sen. Danny Britt [R] |
Sen. Erica Smith-Ingram [D] | Sen. Teresa Van Duyn [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-28 | Ch. SL 2017-195 | |
2017-07-28 | Signed by Gov. 7/28/2017 | |
2017-06-27 | Pres. To Gov. 6/27/2017 | |
2017-06-27 | Ratified | |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2017 |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2017-06-22 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-06-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-22 | House | Amendment Withdrawn A1 |
2017-06-22 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-06-22 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-06-20 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-06-20 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-06-13 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2017-06-13 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-27 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Today's Supplemental Calendar |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Filed |