NC S447 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-30 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-30 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Energy Investment Act
Title
Energy Investment Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S562 (Same As) 2015-03-30 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
H454 (Same As) 2015-04-02 - Ref to the Com on Environment, if favorable, Finance
H454 (Same As) 2015-04-02 - Ref to the Com on Environment, if favorable, Finance