NC S464 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Ch. SL 2011-66
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Ch. SL 2011-66
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Debt Reduction Act of 2011
Title
Debt Reduction Act of 2011
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 64 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Ch. SL 2011-66 | |
2011-05-03 | Signed By Gov. 5/3/2011 | |
2011-05-03 | Pres. To Gov. 5/3/2011 | |
2011-05-02 | Ratified | |
2011-04-28 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-26 | Placed On Cal For 4/28/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-04-20 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-04-14 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-04-14 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-04-13 | Placed On Cal For 4/14/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-04-13 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-04-13 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-04-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-13 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-13 | Placed On Cal For 4/13/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-04-12 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2011-04-12 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-03-31 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2011-03-31 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-30 | Filed |