NC S464 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Smart Start Funds
Title
Smart Start Funds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H262 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgeting
Corporations
Day Care
Dhhs
Early Childhood Education
Education
Elementary Education
Family Issues
Kindergarten
Minors
Nonprofit
Partnership For Children
Public
Social Services
Budgeting
Corporations
Day Care
Dhhs
Early Childhood Education
Education
Elementary Education
Family Issues
Kindergarten
Minors
Nonprofit
Partnership For Children
Public
Social Services
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/S464 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S464v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S464v1.pdf |