NC S56 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Ch. SL 2013-32
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Ch. SL 2013-32
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Wallace/Satellite Annexations
Title
Wallace/Satellite Annexations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-23 - House - Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Ch. SL 2013-32 | |
2013-04-24 | Ratified | |
2013-04-23 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-04-23 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/22/2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-04-17 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-04 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-04-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-03-06 | House | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance |
2013-03-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On State and Local Government |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Filed |