NC S570 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-09 - Ch. SL 2009-257
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-09 - Ch. SL 2009-257
Summary
Indian Trail Charter Revised.
Title
Indian Trail Charter Revised.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-09 | Ch. SL 2009-257 | |
2009-07-09 | Ratified | |
2009-07-08 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2009-07-07 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2009 | |
2009-07-07 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-07-06 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-02 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/2/2009 | |
2009-07-01 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-06-25 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-06-25 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-09 | Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-04-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-07 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Placed On Cal For 4/7/2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Com Amend Adpt & Engross #1 | |
2009-04-01 | Reptd Fav As Amended | |
2009-03-12 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2009-03-11 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S570 |