NC S607 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Temporary Solutions Program Changes
Title
Temporary Solutions Program Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-27 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/26/2023 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
126 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
126 | 6.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text |