NC S617 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-05 - Ch. SL 2009-58
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-05 - Ch. SL 2009-58
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Stalking Law Conforming Changes
Title
Stalking Law Conforming Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-05 | Ch. SL 2009-58 | |
2009-06-05 | Signed By Gov. 6/5/2009 | |
2009-06-01 | Pres. To Gov. 5/29/2009 | |
2009-05-28 | Ratified | |
2009-05-27 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-21 | Placed On Cal For 5/26/2009 | |
2009-05-21 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-21 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-06 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-04-06 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-03-31 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-17 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-03-16 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H620 (Same As) 2010-08-02 - Ch. SL 2010-181