NC S618 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-31 - Ch. SL 2009-385
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-31 - Ch. SL 2009-385
Summary
Urban Area Revitalization Made Uniform.
Title
Urban Area Revitalization Made Uniform.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-31 | Ch. SL 2009-385 | |
2009-07-31 | Signed By Gov. 7/31/2009 | |
2009-07-21 | Pres. To Gov. 7/21/2009 | |
2009-07-20 | Ratified | |
2009-07-16 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-15 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-07-14 | Placed On Cal For 7/15/2009 | |
2009-07-14 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-14 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-07-01 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-07-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-22 | Ref to the Com on Local Government I, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-04-22 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-20 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-16 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-04-15 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-17 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2009-03-16 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H342 (Same As) 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-306
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S618 |