NC S620 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Ch. SL 2011-393
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Ch. SL 2011-393
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Clarify Use of Position
Title
Clarify Use of Position
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-17 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Ch. SL 2011-393 | |
2011-07-01 | Became Law W/o Signature | |
2011-06-20 | Pres. To Gov. 6/20/2011 | |
2011-06-18 | Ratified | |
2011-06-17 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2011-06-17 | Placed On Cal For 6/17/2011 | |
2011-06-17 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2011-06-17 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-17 | Placed On Cal For 6/17/2011 | |
2011-06-17 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-17 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-05-09 | Ref To Com On Government | |
2011-05-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-04 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-05-02 | Placed On Cal For 5/4/2011 | |
2011-05-02 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-05-02 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-19 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2011-04-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-14 | Filed |