NC S647 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
JLEOC Study/ESSA/School Report Card
Title
JLEOC Study/ESSA/School Report Card
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Filed |