NC S655 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Ch. SL 2010-130
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Ch. SL 2010-130
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Increase Drivers License Restoration Fee
Title
Increase Drivers License Restoration Fee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-08 - Senate - Third Reading\Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-07-07 - Senate - Second Reading\Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-05-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-07-07 - Senate - Second Reading\Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-05-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-21 | Ch. SL 2010-130 | |
2010-07-21 | Signed By Gov. 7/21/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Pres. To Gov. 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Ratified | |
2010-07-08 | Concurred On 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-07 | Concurred On 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-06 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2010 | |
2010-07-06 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2010-07-06 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2010-06-30 | Placed On Cal For 7/1/2010 | |
2010-06-30 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-30 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-06-23 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2010-06-23 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-03 | Ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2010-06-03 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-01 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-05-27 | Placed On Cal For 6/1/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-05-26 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-05-26 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-19 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2009-03-18 | Filed |