NC S66 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-10)
Status: Passed on July 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Ch. SL 2010-34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-10)
Status: Passed on July 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Ch. SL 2010-34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Comprehensive Arts Education Plan
Title
Comprehensive Arts Education Plan
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-23 - Senate - Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Ch. SL 2010-34 | |
2010-07-01 | Signed By Gov. 7/1/2010 | |
2010-06-25 | Pres. To Gov. 6/25/2010 | |
2010-06-24 | Ratified | |
2010-06-23 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2010-06-22 | Placed On Cal For 6/23/2010 | |
2010-06-22 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-06-21 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2010-06-21 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2010-06-17 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-16 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/16/2010 | |
2010-06-15 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-15 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-06-09 | Assigned To Appropriations Subcommittee on Education | |
2010-06-01 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2010-06-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-16 | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-04-16 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-14 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-09 | Placed On Cal For 4/14/2009 | |
2009-04-09 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-04-08 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-04-08 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-02-05 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2009-02-04 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H149 (Same As) 2009-02-12 - Ref To Com On Education