NC S68 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-15 - Ch. SL 2009-295
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-15 - Ch. SL 2009-295
Summary
ABC Stores/School/Guilford.
Title
ABC Stores/School/Guilford.
Sponsors
Sen. Katie Dorsett [D] | Sen. Vernon Malone [D] | Sen. Floyd McKissick [D] | Sen. Jerry Tillman [R] |
Sen. Donald Vaughan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-15 | Ch. SL 2009-295 | |
2009-07-15 | Ratified | |
2009-07-14 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2009-07-13 | Placed On Cal For 7/14/2009 | |
2009-07-13 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-07-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-07 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2009 | |
2009-07-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-06-18 | Re-ref Com On Alcoholic Beverage Control | |
2009-06-18 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-14 | Ref to the Com on Local Government I, if favorable, Alcoholic Beverage Control | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-12 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Placed On Cal For 5/12/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-04-30 | Re-ref Com On Commerce | |
2009-04-30 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-04-29 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-04-29 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-02-05 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2009-02-04 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S68 |