NC S68 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Ch. SL 2019-197
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Relocation of Water/Sewer Line Costs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relocation of Water/Sewer Line Costs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-06 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-07-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-14 Ch. SL 2019-197
2019-08-14 Signed by Gov. 8/14/2019
2019-08-08 Pres. To Gov. 8/8/2019
2019-08-07 Ratified
2019-08-06SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-08-06SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2019-08-01SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-07-31HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-07-30HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-30HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-24HousePlaced On Cal For 07/29/2019
2019-07-23HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-07-23HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-07-10HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-10HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-25HouseRe-ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-25HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2019-06-25HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-21HouseRe-ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-21HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-07HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-07HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-07HouseSerial Referral To Energy and Public Utilities Stricken
2019-03-06HouseRef to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-06HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-05HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-03-05SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-03-04SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-04SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-02-28SenateReptd Fav
2019-02-27SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-27SenateReptd Fav
2019-02-21SenateRe-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-21SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-02-18SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-18SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-14SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback