NC S687 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - Ch. SL 2009-418
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - Ch. SL 2009-418
Summary
Exempt Plumb'g Contractor/Well Contractr Reqs.
Title
Exempt Plumb'g Contractor/Well Contractr Reqs.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Atwater [D] | Sen. Stan Bingham [R] | Sen. Tony Foriest [D] | Sen. James Forrester [R] |
Sen. Fletcher Hartsell [R] | Sen. David Rouzer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-05 | Ch. SL 2009-418 | |
2009-08-05 | Signed By Gov. 8/5/2009 | |
2009-07-29 | Pres. To Gov. 7/29/2009 | |
2009-07-28 | Ratified | |
2009-07-27 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2009-07-23 | Placed On Cal For 7/27/2009 | |
2009-07-23 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-07-22 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-21 | Placed On Cal For 7/22/2009 | |
2009-07-21 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-21 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-07-15 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III | |
2009-07-15 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-18 | Ref to the Com on Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship, if favorable, Judiciary III | |
2009-05-18 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-12 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-19 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2009-03-18 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S687 |