NC S743 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Transformational Investments in NC Health
Title
Transformational Investments in NC Health
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-03 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-05-02 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement and Aging |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Pensions and Retirement and Aging Added After Finance |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Chapel Hill
Clinics
Colleges & Universities
Counties
Health Services
Hospitals
Municipalities
Orange County
Personnel
Public
Public Health
Session Laws
Unc
Unc Health Care
Clinics
Colleges & Universities
Counties
Health Services
Hospitals
Municipalities
Orange County
Personnel
Public
Public Health
Session Laws
Unc
Unc Health Care