NC S748 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Ch. SL 2016-24
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Ch. SL 2016-24
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Change Report - Build. & Infrastructure Comm
Title
Change Report - Build. & Infrastructure Comm
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | Ch. SL 2016-24 | |
2016-06-22 | Signed by Gov. 6/22/2016 | |
2016-06-17 | Pres. To Gov. 06/17/2016 | |
2016-06-16 | Ratified | |
2016-06-15 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/15/2016 |
2016-06-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-14 | House | Reptd Fav |
2016-05-27 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2016-05-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-05-26 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On State and Local Government |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H951 (Same As) 2016-04-26 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House