NC S76 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-16 - Re-ref Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-16 - Re-ref Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Wilkes Fox Trapping
Title
Wilkes Fox Trapping
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-16 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H65 (Same As) 2015-05-14 - Ch. SL 2015-13