NC S769 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-18 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-18 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Boost State Nature/Heritage Tourism Industry
Title
Boost State Nature/Heritage Tourism Industry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Ref to Commerce. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1100 (Same As) 2014-06-25 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations