NC S778 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Ref to the Com on Environment and Natural Resources, if favorable, Judiciary I
Status: Introduced on March 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Ref to the Com on Environment and Natural Resources, if favorable, Judiciary I
Summary
Eliminate Overlap Between CAMA and SEPA.
Title
Eliminate Overlap Between CAMA and SEPA.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Ref to the Com on Environment and Natural Resources, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-05-11 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-05 | Placed On Cal For 5/6/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-05-04 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-05-04 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-25 | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources | |
2009-03-24 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S778 |