NC S810 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-16 - Ch. SL 2012-187
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-16 - Ch. SL 2012-187
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Regulatory Reform Act of 2012
Title
Regulatory Reform Act of 2012
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Brock [R] | Sen. Harry Brown [R] | Sen. James Davis [R] | Sen. Richard Gunn [R] |
Sen. William Jackson [R] | Sen. David Rouzer [R] | Sen. Wyatt Tucker [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-27 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - House - Third Reading\M12 Suspend\Rules (Y: 101 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - House - A7 Gillespie\Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - House - A6 Lewis\Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 81 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - House - A4 Gillespie\Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - House - A3 Gillespie\Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - House - A1 Avila\Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-04 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-04 - Senate - Amendment 6 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Amendment 5 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - House - Third Reading\M12 Suspend\Rules (Y: 101 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - House - A7 Gillespie\Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - House - A6 Lewis\Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 81 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - House - A4 Gillespie\Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - House - A3 Gillespie\Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - House - A1 Avila\Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-04 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-04 - Senate - Amendment 6 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Amendment 5 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-16 | Ch. SL 2012-187 | |
2012-07-16 | Signed By Gov. 7/16/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Ratified | |
2012-06-27 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2012-06-26 | Placed On Cal For 6/27/2012 | |
2012-06-26 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-25 | Placed On Cal For 6/26/2012 | |
2012-06-25 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2012-06-21 | Ordered Engrossed | |
2012-06-21 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-21 | Amend Adopted 7 | |
2012-06-21 | Amend Adopted 6 | |
2012-06-21 | Amendment Withdrawn 2 | |
2012-06-20 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-06-20 | Amendment Withdrawn 5 | |
2012-06-20 | Amend Adopted 4 | |
2012-06-20 | Amend Adopted 3 | |
2012-06-20 | Amend Temporarily Displaced 2 | |
2012-06-20 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-19 | Postponed To 6/20/2012 | |
2012-06-18 | Postponed To 6/19/2012 | |
2012-06-14 | Placed On Cal For 6/18/2012 | |
2012-06-14 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-14 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-06-06 | Ref To Com On Commerce and Job Development | |
2012-06-06 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-05 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-04 | Engrossed | |
2012-06-04 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-04 | Amend Adopted 6 | |
2012-06-04 | Reconsidered 3rd Reading | |
2012-05-31 | Engrossed | |
2012-05-31 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-05-31 | Amend Adopted 5 | |
2012-05-31 | Amend Adopted 4 | |
2012-05-31 | Amend Adopted 3 | |
2012-05-30 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-05-30 | Amendment Withdrawn 2 | |
2012-05-30 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-05-29 | Placed On Cal For 5/30/2012 | |
2012-05-29 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-05-24 | Placed On Cal For 5/29/2012 | |
2012-05-24 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-05-24 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-05-21 | Re-ref Com On Commerce | |
2012-05-21 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2012-05-21 | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources | |
2012-05-21 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-17 | Filed |