NC S874 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Ch. SL 2014-55
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Ch. SL 2014-55
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Spruce Pine Deannexation
Title
Spruce Pine Deannexation
Sponsors
Sen. Ralph Hise [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-07-03 - House - Third Reading (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | Ch. SL 2014-55 | |
2014-07-03 | Ratified | |
2014-07-03 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-07-03 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-07-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-07-02 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-07-02 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-07-02 | House | Reptd Fav |
2014-06-30 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2014-06-30 | House | Reptd Fav |
2014-06-18 | House | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance |
2014-06-18 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-06-17 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/12/2014 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/16/2014 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Finance |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Filed |