NC S890 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Ch. SL 2016-69
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Ch. SL 2016-69
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections Every Four Years/Town of Marietta
Title
Elections Every Four Years/Town of Marietta
Sponsors
Sen. Jane Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Ch. SL 2016-69 | |
2016-07-01 | Ratified | |
2016-07-01 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-07-01 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-07-01 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-07-01 | House | Added to Calendar |
2016-07-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-07-01 | House | Reptd Fav |
2016-06-29 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2016-06-29 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-06-29 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Filed |