NC S9 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-17 - Ch. SL 2023-112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-17 - Ch. SL 2023-112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Local Omnibus Changes
Title
Local Omnibus Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-08-16 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 70 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-08-16 - Senate - Conference Report Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 28 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - House - A1 Quick Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2023-06-28 - House - A2 Cervania Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2023-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 66 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-08-16 - Senate - Conference Report Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 28 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - House - A1 Quick Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2023-06-28 - House - A2 Cervania Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2023-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 66 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-17 | Ch. SL 2023-112 | |
2023-08-17 | Ratified | |
2023-08-16 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-08-16 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2023-08-16 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2023-08-16 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-08-16 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2023-08-16 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2023-08-16 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2023-08-16 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2023-08-16 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2023-08-16 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2023-08-15 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 08/16/2023 |
2023-08-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2023-06-28 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2023-06-28 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-06-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-06-28 | House | Amend Failed A2 |
2023-06-28 | House | Amend Failed A1 |
2023-06-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-06-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-06-28 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2023-06-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-06-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-06-19 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-06-19 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-03-21 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-20 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Apex
Boards
Canton
Chaptered
Charters
City Councils
City Managers
Civil Service Boards
Clyde
Counties
Education
Education Boards
Elections
Elementary Education
Emergency Services
Employment
Firefighters & Firefighting
Forsyth County
Greensboro
Guilford County
Haywood County
Hot Springs
Kindergarten
Law Enforcement
Law Enforcement Officers
Local
Local Government
Madison County
Maggie Valley
Mars Hill
Marshall
Mayors
Municipalities
Personnel
Public Officials
Ratified
Secondary Education
Session Laws
Title Change
Wake County
Waynesville
Winston-salem
Boards
Canton
Chaptered
Charters
City Councils
City Managers
Civil Service Boards
Clyde
Counties
Education
Education Boards
Elections
Elementary Education
Emergency Services
Employment
Firefighters & Firefighting
Forsyth County
Greensboro
Guilford County
Haywood County
Hot Springs
Kindergarten
Law Enforcement
Law Enforcement Officers
Local
Local Government
Madison County
Maggie Valley
Mars Hill
Marshall
Mayors
Municipalities
Personnel
Public Officials
Ratified
Secondary Education
Session Laws
Title Change
Wake County
Waynesville
Winston-salem