NC S934 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-26 - Ch. SL 2012-60
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-26 - Ch. SL 2012-60
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Lower Cape Fear Design-Build
Title
Lower Cape Fear Design-Build
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-26 | Ch. SL 2012-60 | |
2012-06-26 | Ratified | |
2012-06-25 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-21 | Placed On Cal For 6/25/2012 | |
2012-06-21 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-21 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-06-11 | Ref To Com On Government | |
2012-06-11 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-11 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-11 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-05-31 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2012-05-31 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-30 | Filed |