NC S992 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Ch. SL 2010-22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Ch. SL 2010-22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Pyrotechnics Operator's License
Title
Pyrotechnics Operator's License
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Apodaca [R] | Sen. Donald Davis [D] | Sen. Eleanor Kinnaird [D] | Sen. John Snow [D] |
Sen. Joshua Stein [D] | Sen. Richard Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-23 - Senate - Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-25 | Ch. SL 2010-22 | |
2010-06-25 | Signed By Gov. 6/25/2010 | |
2010-06-23 | Pres. To Gov. 6/23/2010 | |
2010-06-23 | Ratified | |
2010-06-23 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2010-06-23 | Placed On Cal For 6/23/2010 | |
2010-06-23 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-23 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-22 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-22 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2010-06-21 | Placed On Cal For 6/22/2010 | |
2010-06-17 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-17 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 3 | |
2010-06-15 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-06-15 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2010-06-09 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2010-06-09 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-19 | Ref to the Com on State Government/State Personnel, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-05-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-14 | Placed On Cal For 5/14/2009 | |
2009-05-14 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-05-14 | Re-ref Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources | |
2009-05-14 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-05-13 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-05-12 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-26 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-03-25 | Filed |