ND HB1016 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of job service North Dakota.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of job service North Dakota.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13 |
2023-04-13 | House | Signed by Governor 04/12 |
2023-04-10 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-06 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 77 nays 15 |
2023-04-06 | House | Concurred |
2023-04-05 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2023-04-03 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 43 nays 1 |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 16 0 0 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:46 |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:45 |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Appropriations |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-20 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 13 |
2023-02-20 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-17 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 21 2 0 |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-02-07 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-02-06 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-27 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2023-01-17 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2023-01-06 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Appropriations |