ND HB1035 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subdivision a of subsection 1 of section 65-02-03.1 and section 65-04-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the workforce safety and insurance board of directors and workforce safety and insurance reserves.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subdivision a of subsection 1 of section 65-02-03.1 and section 65-04-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the workforce safety and insurance board of directors and workforce safety and insurance reserves.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-04 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-30 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-30 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-30 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-28 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-04-28 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-28 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-28 | Second reading, passed, yeas 088 nays 004 | |
2009-04-28 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-27 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-14 | Conf comm appointed Nodland Klein Potter | |
2009-04-10 | Conf comm appointed Kasper Keiser Boe | |
2009-04-10 | Refused to concur | |
2009-03-25 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-03-24 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 041 nays 000 | |
2009-03-23 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-20 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 007 n 000 | |
2009-03-03 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor | |
2009-01-20 | Received from House | |
2009-01-19 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 079 nays 013 | |
2009-01-15 | Laid over 2 legislative days | |
2009-01-14 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-01-13 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 012 n 001 | |
2009-01-07 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1035.html |