ND HB1041 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 13 of section 12.1-32-15 and sections 12.1-34-01, 12.1-34-02, 12.1-34-03, and 12.1-34-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the statewide automated victim information and notification system; and to provide an effective date.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 13 of section 12.1-32-15 and sections 12.1-34-01, 12.1-34-02, 12.1-34-03, and 12.1-34-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the statewide automated victim information and notification system; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-24 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-24 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-24 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-24 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-22 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 044 nays 000 | |
2009-04-22 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-20 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-20 | Second reading, passed, yeas 092 nays 000 | |
2009-04-20 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-20 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-14 | Conf comm appointed Olafson Lyson Nelson | |
2009-04-10 | Conf comm appointed Kingsbury Dahl Delmore | |
2009-04-10 | Refused to concur | |
2009-03-23 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-03-23 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-03-19 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-18 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 006 n 000 | |
2009-03-04 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-10 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary | |
2009-01-15 | Received from House | |
2009-01-14 | Second reading, passed, yeas 094 nays 000 | |
2009-01-13 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 013 n 000 | |
2009-01-12 | Committee Hearing 09:45 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1041.html |