ND HB1070 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-13 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-13 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Grindberg, Flakoll, Fischer A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 18-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to alternate firefighters relief association plan benefits.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Grindberg, Flakoll, Fischer A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 18-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to alternate firefighters relief association plan benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-13 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-09 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-01 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-25 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-24 | Second reading, passed, yeas 041 nays 000 | |
2009-03-23 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 007 n 000 | |
2009-03-17 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor | |
2009-01-29 | Received from House | |
2009-01-28 | Second reading, passed, yeas 091 nays 000 | |
2009-01-23 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 011 n 000 | |
2009-01-22 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1070.html |