ND HB1090 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new chapter to title 50 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to child care assistance; and to provide a penalty.
Title
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new chapter to title 50 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to child care assistance; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-05-01 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-30 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-30 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-04-30 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-28 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-28 | Second reading, passed, yeas 090 nays 000 | |
2009-04-28 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-28 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-24 | Appointed Hofstad to replace Nathe on conf comm | |
2009-04-22 | Conference committee report rejected | |
2009-04-22 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-22 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House accede) | |
2009-04-17 | Conf comm appointed Dever Erbele Pomeroy | |
2009-04-17 | Conf comm appointed Nathe Damschen Kilichowski | |
2009-04-17 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-13 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-04-13 | Second reading, passed, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-04-13 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-04-10 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 009 n 005 | |
2009-03-12 | Committee Hearing 03:00 | |
2009-03-06 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-03 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services | |
2009-02-25 | Received from House | |
2009-02-18 | Second reading, passed, yeas 085 nays 008 | |
2009-02-13 | Request return from committee | |
2009-02-05 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-05 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-02-04 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 012 n 001 | |
2009-01-14 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1090.html |