ND HB1112 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 36-24-26 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to penalties for violating meat inspection laws; and to provide a penalty.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 36-24-26 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to penalties for violating meat inspection laws; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-24 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-24 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-24 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-21 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-16 | Second reading, passed, yeas 075 nays 015 | |
2009-04-16 | Concurred | |
2009-04-08 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-04-08 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-04-08 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-06 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 007 n 000 | |
2009-03-12 | Committee Hearing 10:12 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture | |
2009-02-16 | Received from House | |
2009-02-13 | Second reading, passed, yeas 065 nays 026 | |
2009-02-10 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-09 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 012 n 001 | |
2009-01-26 | Rereferred to Agriculture | |
2009-01-26 | Reconsidered | |
2009-01-23 | Second reading, passed, yeas 036 nays 054 | |
2009-01-21 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 010 n 002 | |
2009-01-16 | Committee Hearing 09:45 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1112.html |